THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF WORLD TRADERS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Furthering education and training in connection with the advancement of world trade, and other good causes in general.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of London
Governance
- 21 January 1987: Standard registration
- THE COMPANY OF WORLD TRADERS (Previous name)
- THE COMPANY OF WORLD TRADERS TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Peter Cozens | Chair | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Craig Pattinson | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paige Holt | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Arne Mielken | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ariel Davidoff | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Ellis | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Imam Sayed Razawi | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Sheila Saddler McGregor | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Michael Turner | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Emilie Goodhew | Trustee | 02 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.27k | £85.87k | £93.98k | £142.57k | £93.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.62k | £130.88k | £102.48k | £167.71k | £102.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 09 December 2024 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 09 December 2024 | 132 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30TH SEPTEMBER 1986 as amended on 19 May 2022
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF POOR PERSONS ENGAGED IN WORLD TRADE AND THE WIVES, WIDOWS, CHILDREN AND OTHER DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS BEING IN NECESSITOUS FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES; (B) TTHE FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN CONNECTION WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OR WORLD TRADE BOTH WITHIN AND WITHOUT THE CITY OF LONDON; (C) TTHE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS PURPOSE OR PURPOSES IN SUCH SHARES BETWEEN THEM IF MORE THAN ONE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT WITH POWER TO APPLY SUCH INCOME IN OR TOWARDS THE ESTABLISHMENT OF ANY CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR ORGANISATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Chawton End Close
Four Marks
ALTON
Hampshire
GU34 5BF
- Phone:
- 07377 712741
- Email:
- clerk@world-traders.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window