Financial history MARKAZ UD DAWAT WAL IRSHAD LONDON UK MUSLIM COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 295836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £264.99k £240.38k £311.60k £360.23k £353.68k
Total expenditure £254.48k £238.57k £305.86k £290.82k £295.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A