THE DORKING CONCERTGOERS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To educate the public in the art and science of music through the promotion of an annual series of classical music concerts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 22 December 1986: Standard registration
- DCS (Working name)
- THE DORKING HALLS CONCERTGOERS SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Virginia Susan Wheeler | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Pratt | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWIN CHIVERTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW DORMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANA ELIZABETH SMITH BILLARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PAM CHIVERTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.88k | £9.54k | £84.88k | £64.26k | £48.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.40k | £8.05k | £22.68k | £53.32k | £39.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REVISED RULES ADOPTED 10TH NOVEMBER 1986 AS AMENDED ON 30TH OCTOBER 1997 AS AMENDED ON 26TH OCTOBER 1998 AND 26 OCTOBER 2009 as amended on 18 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Lodge
Horsham Road
South Holmwood
DORKING
Surrey
RH5 4LZ
- Phone:
- 01306888922
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window