Governing document THE DORKING CONCERTGOERS SOCIETY
Charity Number: 295839

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REVISED RULES ADOPTED 10TH NOVEMBER 1986 AS AMENDED ON 30TH OCTOBER 1997 AS AMENDED ON 26TH OCTOBER 1998 AND 26 OCTOBER 2009 as amended on 18 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.