HALSTOCK COMMUNITY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising and social events to serve the community of Halstock and the surrounding villages. This includes the provision Sport including badminton and short mat bowls, Artsreach presentations and meetings and events of several organisations and charities. Art classes, coffee mornings with crafts. Parties Flower Show.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 24 February 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER DAVID BRINCK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Amanda Holloway | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Diane Turk | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Diane Howell | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Stevens | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Stevens | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Hill | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Clary | Trustee | 14 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Richard Buckland | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
RODNEY EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LISA POVEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CYNNIE BUCKLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.66k | £2.98k | £7.43k | £8.64k | £9.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.69k | £4.28k | £4.68k | £6.90k | £4.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 February 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 NOVEMBER 1986, AMENDED 8 JULY 198 AND 7 FEBRUARY 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HALSTOCK IN THE COUNTY OF DORSET WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS,LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
HALSTOCK VILLAGE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Halstock Community Hall
Halstock
YEOVIL
Somerset
BA22 9SH
- Phone:
- 01935891822
- Email:
- pahaska@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window