Trustees HALSTOCK COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 295841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER DAVID BRINCK Chair
None on record
Amanda Holloway Trustee 10 March 2025
None on record
Valerie Diane Turk Trustee 13 January 2025
None on record
Diane Howell Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Dawn Stevens Trustee 07 February 2024
None on record
Philip Stevens Trustee 07 February 2024
None on record
Anthony Hill Trustee 11 July 2016
None on record
David Clary Trustee 14 July 2015
None on record
Richard Buckland Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
RODNEY EDWARDS Trustee
None on record
LISA POVEY Trustee
None on record
CYNNIE BUCKLAND Trustee
None on record