REFRESH LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Respite care and convalescence for severely disabled and ventilator-dependent people too dependent to be acceptable in normal registered homes. Rehabilitation services to practice how to return home and live independently. Nationally accredited NVQ training centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 February 1987: Standard registration
- 15 April 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 15 April 2016: Funds transferred to 1159472 CS DISABLED HOLIDAYS LTD
- REFRESH (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2011 | 31/01/2012 | 31/01/2013 | 31/01/2014 | 31/01/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228.92k | £153.03k | £112.68k | £51.96k | £34.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £302.77k | £298.34k | £174.13k | £50.90k | £23.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2015 | 03 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2015 | 12 May 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2014 | 23 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2014 | 18 July 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2013 | 21 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2013 | 02 August 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2ND APRIL 1986
Charitable objects
(A) TO TAKE OVER THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF THE REAL AND PERSONAL PROPERTY OF AN UNINCORPORATED CHARITABLE SOCIETY KNOWN AS REFRESH. (B) TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL PROVISION FOR CHARITABLE ESTABLISHMENTS DESIGNED OR ADAPTED FOR THE ACCOMMODATION OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM RESIDUAL RESPIRATION, PARALYSIS CONSEQUENT UPON POLIOMYELITIS OR OTHER CRIPPLING DISEASES OR PERSONS INCAPACITATED OR CRIPPLED FOR ANY REASON WHATSOEVER AND PARTICULARLY TO PROVIDE FOR SUCH PERSONS AND THOSE ADMINISTERING TO THEM HOLIDAYS AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window