THE MASSAGE EDUCATION RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports the education research and development in massage and associate disciplines. We do this in conjunction with the Northern Institute of Massage at Bury and the University at Leeds and Central Lancashire at Preston.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 January 1987: Standard registration
- 27 September 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- THE L C S P EDUCATION AND RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10 | £200 | £674 | £926 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.74k | £10.94k | £5.52k | £7.52k | £9.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 26 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 22 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 19 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 14 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29/09/1986 AS AMENDED ON 06/03/2013
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT RESEARCH INTO THE SCIENCE AND ART OF REMEDIAL MASSAGE AND KINDRED SUBJECTS. (II) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN REMEDIAL MASSAGE MANIPULATIVE THERAPY ELECTROTHERAPY AND ALLIED THERAPIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window