PRINTING HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to promote and encourage the study and knowledge of and to foster and extend interest in the history of all forms and aspects of printing and associated activities, techniques, equipment, materials, organisation, and products
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 January 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alexandra Franklin | Chair | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Stenner | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Kither | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Arthur McKenzie | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ben Weiner | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Osbaldestin | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS SEBASTIAN CARTER | Trustee | 25 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAMES EDWARDES M'KENZIE-HALL | Trustee | 10 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr CAROLINE ELIZABETH ARCHER | Trustee | 10 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MICHAEL LOTON TWYMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD LAWRENCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR JAMES MARTINDALE MOSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Giles Howard Mandelbrote | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr Paul Westcott Nash | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.09k | £18.17k | £17.48k | £19.49k | £12.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.80k | £10.65k | £22.45k | £17.63k | £13.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 December 2023 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 November 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 30TH OCTOBER 1986
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE HISTORY OF ALL FORMS AND ASPECTS OF PRINTING AND ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES, TECHNIQUES, EQUIPMENT, MATERIALS, ORGANISATIONS AND PRODUCTS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. BRIDE FOUNDATION INSTITUTE
14 BRIDE LANE
LONDON
EC4Y 8EQ
- Phone:
- 07780608659
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window