Accounts and annual returns THE READING HINDU TEMPLE

Charity Number: 295951
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 21 August 2006 03 December 2007 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 August 2006 03 December 2007 165 days late
Annual return 31 December 2005 08 March 2007 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 08 March 2007 128 days late
Annual return 31 December 2004 31 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 31 October 2005 On Time