FREE REPRESENTATION UNIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(a) Relief of poverty by providing legal advice and representation before tribunals and courts in the United Kingdom for those who cannot otherwise afford such advice or representation. (b) Assisting in the education and training of law students, pupils, trainees, junior barristers and solicitors through the delivery of (a) above.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
- East Sussex
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Kent
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
- Surrey
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 19 January 1987: Standard registration
- F R U (Working name)
- FRU (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Fealy QC | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Fenella Morris QC | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
SEAN JONES QC | Trustee | 21 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £612.96k | £439.59k | £356.28k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £484.61k | £476.73k | £425.46k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £558.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £54.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £465.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £19.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 August 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 04 August 2023 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 DECEMBER 1986 MARCH 1994 AND AMENDED 13 APRIL 2005 AND 11 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROVIDING LEGAL ADVICE AND REPRESENTATION BEFORE TRIBUNALS AND COURTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THOSE WHO CANNOT AFFORD SUCH ADVICE OR REPRESENTATION; AND (2) TO ASSIST IN THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OR LAW STUDENTS, PUPILS, TRAINEES, JUNIOR BARRISTERS AND SOLICITORS THROUGH THE DELIVERY OF (1) ABOVE.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Floor
10/11 Gray's Inn Square
Gray's Inn
London
WC1R 5JD
- Phone:
- 02076119550
- Email:
- admin@thefru.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window