Financial history LOWER BEEDING HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 296004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.01k £2.84k £1.37k £3.43k £1.73k
Total expenditure £7.49k £2.63k £1.64k £3.74k £1.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A