YOUNG WOMEN'S HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Young Women's Hub is an independent school and charity which supports vulnerable young women 11-16 by providing a safe, nurturing environment in which they are able to access education,vocational program's, mentoring and family support to help them develop their independent life skills, maintain healthy relationship's and provide post 16 advice and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lewisham
Governance
- 29 January 1987: Standard registration
- LEWISHAM YOUNG WOMEN'S PROJECT AND RESOURCE CENTRE (Previous name)
- LEWISHAM YOUNG WOMEN'S RESOURCE PROJECT LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Bright | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
carol Mulling's | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
EMMA MOORE | Trustee | 15 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Hayleigh Senior | Trustee | 10 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £222.73k | £254.69k | £217.27k | £291.38k | £363.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £238.63k | £204.92k | £255.11k | £276.42k | £338.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 195 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH OCTOBER 1986
Charitable objects
I. TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG WOMEN, AGED 14-25, IN THE BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM, THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURTY AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. II. TO EDUCATE AND TRAIN YOUNG WOMEN, AGED 14-25, IN THE BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM, WHO THROUGH THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED AND ARE UNABLE TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT AND FURTHER THEIR EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
LEWISHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
308 BROWNHILL ROAD
LONDON
SE6 1AU
- Phone:
- 0208 698 6675
- Email:
- info@YWH.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window