Financial history CENTRE 70

Charity number: 296020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £716.00k £729.48k £617.70k £633.01k £860.98k
Total expenditure £651.24k £622.65k £672.74k £766.24k £857.10k
Income from government contracts £230.94k £220.65k £195.65k £188.94k £150.42k
Income from government grants £84.50k N/A N/A £118.80k £262.21k
Income - Donations and legacies £61.77k £115.96k £64.71k £47.97k £63.30k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £653.51k £613.28k £617.66k £584.29k £793.81k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £721 £234 £37 £745 £3.88k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £651.24k £622.65k £672.74k £672.74k £857.10k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £20.35k £19.60k £17.35k £0 £14.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £93.49k £0