Trustees EAST ANGLIAN TRACTION ENGINE SOCIETY
Charity number: 296027

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Abigail Plant | Chair | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Charles Clarke | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stuart John Hines | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Verity Lynne Percival | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catharine Ann Jackson | Trustee | 25 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Robert Pumfrey | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lewis Webb | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daphne Rumball | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Charles Brighty | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID BENJAMIN GOWLETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TERRY TABERER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Robert John PUMFREY BEM | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.