Financial history BARONS COURT PROJECT

Charity number: 296034
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £311.56k £442.91k £447.94k £438.40k £546.05k
Total expenditure £277.50k £413.00k £430.97k £431.31k £475.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £76.71k £76.71k £76.00k £151.71k £152.25k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £192.76k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £22.19k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £329.49k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.62k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £419.20k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £56.07k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.55k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0