FRIENDS OF ST EDMUND CAMPION WATLINGTON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the Catholic faith and Roman Catholic charitable institutions in the parish of St Edmund Campion Watlington, and in particular to assist in the provision, furnishing, refurbishing and maintenance, of the buildings and property of the church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 29 January 1987: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF THE SACRED HEARTWATLINGTON CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew James Foster Fr | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ted Kalborg | Trustee | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Carroll | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Pritchard | Trustee | 02 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.68k | £19.59k | £31.10k | £25.90k | £25.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.60k | £37.80k | £48.71k | £18.31k | £18.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 July 2024 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 08 July 2024 | 154 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 15 February 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 15 February 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED THE 2ND DECEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE TO PROMOTE THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH AND ROMAN CATHOLIC CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS IN THE PARISH OF THE SACRED HEART WATLINGTON AND IN PARTICULAR TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION FURNISHING REFURBISHING AND MAINTENANCE OF THE BUILDINGS AND PROPERTY OF THE SAID CHURCH OF THE SACRED HEART.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF THE SACRED HEART WATLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Spring Lane
WATLINGTON
Oxfordshire
OX49 5QN
- Phone:
- 07967681890
- Email:
- mleavey.leavey15@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window