FRIENDS OF THE EAST SUSSEX RECORD OFFICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance public education in the history of East Sussex by assisting in the mantenance and services offered by East Sussex Record Office.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- East Sussex
Governance
- 08 May 1987: Standard registration
- 03 September 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FESRO (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.00k | £32.35k | £7.77k | £29.62k | £7.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.59k | £13.86k | £6.18k | £15.21k | £10.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 20 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 11 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | 11 May 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 12 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTON ADOPTED 25TH MARCH 1987
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF HISTORY OF EAST SUSSEX IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTING IN MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF SERVICES OFFERED BY THE EAST SUSSEX RECORD OFFICE.
Area of benefit
EAST SUSSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window