Trustees WORLD ASSOCIATION FOR CHRISTIAN COMMUNICATION
Charity Number: 296073

Charity reporting is up to date (96 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Corinne Barnes | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juha Rajamaki | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Netani Rika | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matomklawe Kpalla | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rania Rashad William | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alba Sabate Gauxachs | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Luis David Morales Alba | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Vincent Rajkumar Rajendran | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gregg Brekke | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Lee | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR JAMES McDONNELL FCIPR | Trustee | 09 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
EMBERT CHARLES | Trustee | 08 October 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.