THE HARROW DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of pupils at Harrow and The John Lyon School and such other charitable purpose as the Trustees may declare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£9,914,228
Donations and legacies | £9.91m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£10,009,732
Raising funds | £1.38m | |
Charitable activities | £8.63m | |
Other | £0 |
-£17,188 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.38m | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.63m |
People

7 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£300k to £350k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Harrow
Governance
- 28 December 1988: Standard registration
- 04 October 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Philip John Glover BA | Chair | 28 August 2018 |
|
|||||
James Christopher Seppala | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Mark Wallace | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ADAM DAVID HART LLB FRSA | Trustee | 26 September 2019 | ||||||
PATRICK WONG | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|||||
SHASHI NIKHIL KISHORE HIRDARAMANI | Trustee | 01 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.85m | £7.30m | £10.12m | £8.80m | £9.91m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.74m | £7.88m | £10.39m | £8.31m | £10.01m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £10.84m | £7.29m | £10.12m | £8.80m | £9.91m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £12.25k | £10.53k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £495.81k | £50.29k | £11.00k | £1.56m | £208.33k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.77m | £6.98m | £9.37m | £7.03m | £8.63m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £966.76k | £904.10k | £1.02m | £1.28m | £1.38m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £2.77k | £2.23k | £666 | £784 | £511 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.24m | £1.03m | £1.00m | £853.02k | £695.61k | |
|
Other assets | £737.36k | £301.92k | £1.01m | £883.12k | £2.20m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £579.51k | £532.97k | £1.32m | £568.07k | £1.84m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF FOUNDATION DATED 28 JANUARY 1987 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25/11/2015 as amended on 24 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT HARROW SCHOOL, BY ASSISTING IN DEVELOPMENT, RENOVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF BOARDING HOUSES AT THE SCHOOL AND TO PROVIDE CRAFT DESIGN AND TECHNOLOGY CENTRE AT THE SCHOOL. SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 28 December 1988 : Standard registration
- 04 October 2017 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE HARROW DEVELOPMENT TRUST
5A HIGH STREET
HARROW ON THE HILL
MIDDLESEX
HA1 3HP
- Phone:
- 02088728500
- Email:
- hdt@harrowschool.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window