THE T D LEWIS SCHOLARSHIP

Charity number: 296109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of scholarships to students of the University of Northampton

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,438
Total expenditure: £5,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 February 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE T D LEWIS NO 2 SCHOLARSHIP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TREVOR GEORGE Chair
None on record
Charles Brooke Lewis Trustee 27 November 2024
None on record
JANE ALEXANDRA FORSYTH Trustee 13 December 2011
None on record
JONATHAN CHURCH Trustee 13 December 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.62k £4.14k £4.23k £4.18k £5.44k
Total expenditure £6.10k £5.50k £3.50k £4.50k £5.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 April 2024 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1b High Street
Lamport
Northampton
NN6 9HB
Phone:
07753567978
Website:

No information available