THE THOMAS LATIMER CLEAVE MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education and in furtherance thereof to provide prizes, awards, scholarships and grants to students of food science subjects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 February 1987: Standard registration
- THE ROYAL INSTITUTE OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Royal Society for Public Health | Trustee | 01 October 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99 | £81 | £81 | £204 | £418 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2024 | 311 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 9TH FEBRUARY 1987
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION TO PROVIDE PRIZES AWARDS SCHOLARSHIPS AND GRANTS TO STUDENTS OF FOOD SCIENCE SUBJECTS AT THE ROYAL INSTITUTE OF PUBLIC HEALTH AND HYGIENE OR ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL SOCIET FOR PUBLIC HEALTH
JOHN SNOW HOUSE
59 MANSELL STREET
LONDON
E1 8AN
- Phone:
- 02072657370
- Email:
- pparthipan@rsph.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window