EASTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MAINLY USED BY LOCAL GROUPS WITHIN THE VILLAGE SUCH AS BROWNIES, ART CLASSES, YOGA, AND PILATES. THE VILLAGE HALL HOSTS AN ANNUAL XMAS EVENT FOR THE VILLAGERS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £750 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 25 February 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cheryl Westbury | Chair | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Diana Newington | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Lofts | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.81k | £20.98k | £13.02k | £12.34k | £15.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.24k | £5.32k | £42.43k | £15.16k | £10.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.37k | £4.92k | N/A | £750 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29TH SEPTEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF EASTON IN THE OUT PARISH OF ST. CUTHBERT IN THE COUNTY OF SOMERSET WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LWISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
VILLAGE OF EASTON IN THE OUT PARISH OF ST CUTHBERT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Easton Village Hall
Ebbor Lane
Easton
WELLS
Somerset
BA5 1EP
- Phone:
- 01749 871233
- Email:
- cherylwestbury@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window