KURT HAHN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The KH Trust seeks to foster Anglo-German understanding in memory of Kurt Hahn. The Trust awards scholarships for German nationals to study at the University of Cambridge at postgraduate level, for Cambridge graduates who are non-German nationals to study or undertake research in Germany, and for non-German nationals of any level to attend language courses in Germany over the University vacations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cambridgeshire
- Germany
Governance
- 13 February 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Jane Rose | Chair | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr BERNHARD FULDA | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr CHARLOTTE WOODFORD | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr AXEL GELFERT | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.04k | £14.22k | £13.03k | £15.73k | £17.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.15k | £0 | £5.41k | £20.40k | £30.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 March 2022 | 288 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH JANUARY 1987
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SHCOLARSHIPS GRANTS LOANS PRIZES AWARDS AND OTHER FORMS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE PERSONS TO BENEFIT FROM FURTHER EDUCATION IN CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY AND IN THE UNIVERSITIES OF THE FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF GERMAY
Area of benefit
1. UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE 2. FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF GERMANY
Contact information
- Address:
-
University Of Cambridge
International Student Office
Student Services Centre
New Museums Site
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 3PT
- Phone:
- 01223761806
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window