BRICK LANE HOUSING AND COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisting residents and claimants living and working in Tower Hamlets of Bangladeshi origin and others on education, housing, employment , human rights and community development. Liaise and work with UK government agencies and NGOs in education, housing, cultural heritage, development and to relieve the sufferings and distress of people in need of health and social care services in Bangladesh.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tower Hamlets
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 03 March 1987: Standard registration
- BRICK LANE TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAH MUNIM | Chair |
|
||||||
MOHAMMED ABDUL MUKIT MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED OSMAN GANI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £50 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £30 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 February 2025 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 189 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21ST JANUARY 1987
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY HOMELESSNESS AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST PEOPLE OF BANGLADESHI ORIGIN AND OTHERS IN TOWER HAMLETS AND ELSEWHERE, BOTH IN THE UK AND IN BANGLADESH.
Area of benefit
TOWER HAMLETS, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Brick Lane
LONDON
E1 6PU
- Phone:
- 02072475755
- Email:
- bricklanetrust@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window