BRENT BEREAVEMENT SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities of the charity are practical support or individual counselling to relieve suffering and mental ill-health amongst the recently bereaved, prevent the need for hospital admission, work in close association with health staff and social services, train others who care for the bereaved, and to create and promote informed public opinion on the needs of the bereaved.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £20,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brent
Governance
- 24 March 1987: Standard registration
- BRENT BEREAVEMENT PROJECT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carlos Calvet Ortin | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sepideh Khosravani | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIO VIEIRA | Trustee | 15 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Mel Collins | Trustee | 01 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
LYDIA KHALIL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RITA PRICE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.11k | £90.73k | £113.45k | £133.34k | £35.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.71k | £86.53k | £85.63k | £144.15k | £88.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £101.67k | £20.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 FEBRUARY 1987 AS AMENDED 7 OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND PREVENT SUFFERING, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG THE BEREAVED IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BRENT
Area of benefit
BRENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
379-381 High Road
Willesden
LONDON
NW10 2JR
- Phone:
- 02084596818
- Email:
- info@bbsonline.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window