Financial history ASSOCIATION FOR THE STUDY OF MODERN ITALY (ASMI)

Charity number: 296240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £39.42k £20.89k £36.05k £20.34k £28.04k
Total expenditure £24.25k £28.11k £24.09k £13.87k £25.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A