Accounts and annual returns NEWHAM BOYS' CLUB

Charity number: 296255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 23 January 2025 268 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 06 September 2023 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 22 June 2023 418 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 August 2021 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required