THE HIGHER EDUCATION IN ART AND DESIGN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The HEAD Trust is a registered charity and is dedicated to the advancement of public education through the appreciation of art, craft and design. In 2014-15 a grant of ?5000 was given to the Sorrell Foundation to support the production of a video 'CreativeJourney' that provides art, design and media careers information for young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 April 1987: Standard registration
- HEAD TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Sargeant BA | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Louise Moran BA, MA | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michele Bridget Gregson | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Margaret Clare Ayliffe | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Graham Vaughan | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor Maureen Wayman | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108 | £63 | £5 | £77 | £1.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.72k | £69 | £96 | £861 | £336 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST DECEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION THROUGH THE APPRECIATION OF ART, CRAFT AND DESIGN AS FOLLOWS: (A) BY SUPPORTING, ORGANISING, PROMOTING OR ASSISTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF BRITISH ART CRAFT AND DESING EDUCATION. (B) BY CO-OPERATING WITH THE CONFERENCE FOR HIGHER EDUCATION IN ART AND DESIGN (OR ANY OTHER SIMILAR BODY) IN ARRANGING FOR THE WORK OF BRITISH ART CRAFT AND DESIGN STUDENTS (INCLUDING FOREIGN STUDENTS STUDYING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM) TO BE EXHIBITED PUBLICLY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
99 SOMMERVILLE ROAD
BRISTOL
BS7 9AE
- Phone:
- 07970751978
- Email:
- JOHNSTEERS44@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window