WOMEN AND HEALTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Women and Health is a charity working in the London Borough of Camden. It provides low cost complementary and alternative medicine treatments and counselling services for women living or working in the borough. (Counselling for women living or seeing a GP in the borough). W&H provides well being classes, advisory GP and outreachs services to isolated and housebound women.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £156,096 from 1 government contract(s) and £23,203 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Camden
Governance
- 12 March 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nivethika Nocher | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dominique Logan | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sneha Paleja | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Susanne Millecker | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Dix | Trustee | 03 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lesia Haliv | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ELIZABETH ANN RAWSON | Trustee | 20 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £299.84k | £320.51k | £286.77k | £295.34k | £274.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £350.88k | £291.96k | £301.58k | £320.13k | £320.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £152.44k | £152.44k | £163.44k | £166.10k | £156.10k | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.85k | £10.81k | N/A | N/A | £23.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH FEBRUARY 1987
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF WOMEN RESIDENT IN SOMERS TOWN AND CAMDEN TOWN IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SUCH WOMEN ABOUT ALL MATTERS CONCERNING THEIR HEALTH.
Area of benefit
SOMERS TOWN AND CAMDEN TOWN
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOMEN & HEALTH
4 CAROL STREET
LONDON
NW1 0HU
- Phone:
- 02074822786
- Email:
- fariba@women-and-health.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window