STREETWISE YOUTH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 06 March 1987: Standard registration
- 30 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- SW5 (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH FEBRUARY 1987
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE MORAL AND SOCIAL WELFARE AND THE PRESERVATION OF THE HEALTH OF YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE AT RISK OF BEING INVOLVED IN PROSTITUTION IN THE GREATER LONDON AREA OR ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS AND TO ESTABLISH MAINTAIN AND DEVELOP A SERVICE FOR THE GIVING TO SUCH PERSONS OF INDIVIDUAL AND GROUP COUNSELLING, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND HELP OF ANY KIND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION AS TO AREA), IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF KENSINGTON AND CHELSEA.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON AREA OR ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window