SPECIAL OBJECTIVES FOR THE LOCAL DISABLED (S O L D )
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SOLD runs a studio workshop on the South Lowestoft industrial estate which is attended by up to 20 people a day who all have physical and sensory disabilities of varying degrees. We offer a wide variety of woodworking and other craft activities such as pottery, art, textiles, cooking and domestic skills in a specially adapted kitchen, and computer skills in our computer suite.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £125,259 from 2 government contract(s) and £1,350 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 02 June 1987: Standard registration
- 14 May 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 14 May 2024: Funds transferred to 1135640 ACCESS COMMUNITY TRUST
- S O L D (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.69k | £144.10k | £142.84k | £142.50k | £139.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.31k | £145.24k | £140.29k | £143.10k | £141.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £124.51k | £132.02k | £136.04k | £120.69k | £125.26k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.48k | N/A | £15.79k | £1.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 September 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD SEPTEMBER 1986 AS AMENDED 12 FEBRUARY 1987, 29 NOVEMBER 1993 AND 4 JULY 2005.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF DISABLED, BLIND OR LONG TERM SICK PERSONS IN ANY MANNER WITHIN THE ADMINISTRATIVE BOUNDARIES OF SUFFOLK AND NORFOLK COUNTY COUNCILS AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE SUCH PERSONS OPPORTUNITIES FOR GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN A BUSINESS ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
SUFFOLK AND NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window