Accounts and annual returns FAKENHAM HIGH SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 296288
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2013 27 September 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2012 04 February 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2011 25 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2010 24 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required