Financial history SOS SAHEL INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity number: 296311
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £936.99k £570.48k £139.51k £9.41k £20
Total expenditure £943.84k £667.96k £217.86k £19.06k £129.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £895.99k £561.60k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £518 £447 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £40.48k £8.44k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £24.01k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £927.34k £641.59k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £16.50k £26.36k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £5.79k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A