THE MOUNT CARMEL HOSTEL FOR RECOVERING ALCOHOLICS TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the Trust is to accept donations on behalf of Mount Carmel Hostel for Recovering Alcoholics Ltd and to use such funds for the benefit of the community by providing housing and any such associated amenities to recovering alcoholics in necessitous circumstances upon terms appropriate to their means.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lambeth
- Merton
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 31 March 1987: Standard registration
- THE MOUNT CARMEL HOTEL FOR RECOVERING ALCOHOLICS TRUST FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM HUGHES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Victoria Izzard | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jim Maguire | Trustee | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY HOWE | Trustee | 16 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANNABEL HAAK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY KENT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £437 | £44 | £6 | £31 | £16 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.32k | £1.32k | £1.32k | £1.31k | £1.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH FEBRUARY 1987
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF CARE AND REHABILITATION OF RECOVERING ALCOHOLICS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AFTER THEIR DISCHARGE FROM ANY OF THE RECOGNISED ALCOHOLIC UNITS AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE TO ACQUIRE BUILD OR LEASE ANY PREMISES FOR THE PURPOSE OF A RESIDENCE FOR HOUSING AND SHELTERING BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Aldrington Road
London
SW16 1TH
- Phone:
- 02087697674
- Email:
- info@mountcarmel.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window