JULIE ROSE MEMORIAL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 11 March 1987: Standard registration
- 19 September 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26TH FEBRUARY 1987
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PUBLIC OF EAST KENT, SUCH FACILITIES TO INCLUDE PROVISIONS OF AN ATHLETIC FACILITY FOR THE PEOPLE OF EAST KEN, WHICH FACILITY WILL BE OPEN TO ALL PERSONS, AND IN PARTICULAR, TO BLIND AND DISABLED PERSONS.
Area of benefit
EAST KENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window