Financial history THORNBURY AND DISTRICT HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 296345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18.83k £11.35k £16.69k £31.72k £31.90k
Total expenditure £8.53k £7.14k £7.01k £11.55k £18.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.25k £6.25k £9.84k £6.25k £12.34k