THORNBURY AND DISTRICT HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LOCAL MUSEUM RUN BY VOLUNTEERS. OPEN TO THE PUBLIC ON 3 DAYS A WEEK. COVERS THORNBURY TOWN AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT. CONSERVES AND DISPLAYS ARTEFACTS OF LOCAL PROVENANCE. UNDERTAKES SOME RESEARCH. RUNS ONE ASSOCIATED GROUP: ARCHAEOLOGY. ORGANISES OCCASIONAL PUBLIC TALKS AND WALKS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £12,341 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 08 April 1987: Standard registration
- THORNBURY AND DISTRICT MUSEUM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Marks | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Forest Girdlestone | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stanley Michael Morrissey | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mr J M Shepherd | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID THOMAS | Trustee | 11 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN ELTON | Trustee | 11 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS M M WISE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS P D MONTGOMERY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS J NEWLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.83k | £11.35k | £16.69k | £31.72k | £31.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.53k | £7.14k | £7.01k | £11.55k | £18.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.25k | £6.25k | £9.84k | £6.25k | £12.34k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION 6TH JANUARY 1987
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE DISTRICT OF NORTHAVON IN THE COUNTY OF AVON AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE BY THE PROVISION AT THORNBURY IN THE DISTRICT OF NORTHAVON IN THE COUNTY OF AVON AND ELSEWHERE OF A MUSEUM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thornbury & District Heritage Trust
c/o Town Hall
35 High Street
Thornbury
BRISTOL
BS35 2AR
- Phone:
- 01454857774
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window