THE INTERNATIONAL FEDERATION OF AIRWORTHINESS FOR AEROSPACE ENGINEERING, MAINTENANCE AND CONTINUING AIRWORTHINESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activity is the work of the IFA Board which agrees the strategy to achieve the maximum benefit to our members and the public. Meetings also attended with other Air Safety organisations which include; EASA, RAeS & ICAO airworthiness panel. In addition to the above IFA sponsors the attendance of it's members staff on Airworthiness courses and Scholarships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Bahrain
- Bulgaria
- France
- Guyana
- Hong Kong
- India
- Kenya
- Kuwait
- Netherlands
- Nigeria
- Philippines
- Spain
- Taiwan
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
Governance
- 18 March 1987: Standard registration
- INTERNATIONAL FEDERATION OF AIRWORTHINESS - I F A (Working name)
- THE INTERNATIONAL FEDERATION FOR AEROSPACE ENGINEERING, MAINTENANCE AND CONTINUING AIRWORTHINESS (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Olufisan | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Courteney | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma BOSSOM | Trustee | 03 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN SIMMONS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.20k | £1.69k | £9.17k | £9.75k | £12.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.42k | £18.13k | £17.98k | £20.97k | £21.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH NOVEMBER 1986, AS AMENDED 6TH NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE AIRWORTHINESS AND AIR SAFETY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (II) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AIRCRAFT ENGINEERING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Alwen Walk
BEDFORD
MK41 7AY
- Phone:
- 07746773170
- Email:
- sec@ifairworthy.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window