SIR JOSEPH WILLIAMSON'S CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trustees' Report and Financial Statements will follow by post
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Medway
Governance
- 17 March 1987: Standard registration
- SIR JOSEPH WILLIAMSON'S MATHEMATICAL SCHOOL (Previous name)
- SIR JOSEPH WILLIAMSONS' MATHEMATICAL SCHOOL AT ROCHESTER (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Russell John Race | Chair | 20 October 2014 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr Paula Wilhelmina Hamilton | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Gail Mary Christina Halls | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Stephanie Mary Brivio OBE | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Shirley Anne Gurteen | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
IAN MCLEOD | Trustee | 04 December 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Michael Dodd | Trustee | 14 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
The Very Rev. Dr. Philip John Hesketh | Trustee | 06 March 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £189.02k | £182.47k | £186.75k | £228.28k | £208.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.40k | £113.90k | £89.23k | £112.53k | £350.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE BOARD OF EDUCATION OF 3RD FEBRUARY 1910 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 26TH JUNE 1912, 8TH MAY 1915, 25TH JANUARY 1921, 5TH NOVEMBER 1921, 10TH FEBRUARY 1932 AND 19TH FEBRUARY 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 14TH NOVEMBER 2005 AND 30 MARCH 2011 AND 5 NOVEMBER 2012 as amended on 10 Jan 2023 as amended on 10 Jan 2023 as amended on 10 Jan 2023 as amended on 10 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: (A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH: I. THE PROVISION OF A SITE IN ROCHESTER FOR THE SCHOOL; AND II. FURTHERING THE EDUCATION OF BENEFICIARIES ATTENDING THE SCHOOL CONDUCTED ON THE CHARITY’S PROPERTY BY THE AWARD OF PRIZES (OR OTHER SUITABLE REWARD); AND III. GIVING GRANTS, BURSARIES OR OTHER PAYMENTS TO BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE (OR TO EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS ATTENDED BY SUCH BENEFICIARIES); AND IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL OR OTHER ASSISTANCE TO SUCH BENEFICIARIES TO ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING OR TO ENABLE THEM TO TRAVEL ABROAD TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION; AND (B) TO PROVIDE AND SUPPORT EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL OR ANCILLARY FACILITIES AND SERVICES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BENEFICIARIES AND THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
ROCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Maynard Place
CHATHAM
ME5 7HD
- Phone:
- 07795231823
- Email:
- theclerksjwct@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window