ARP CHARITABLE SERVICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Foundation66 exists to reduce the harm caused by problem alcohol & drug use. We support people to achieve positive change and freedom from the harmful effects of alcohol and drugs by providing services including treatment, support and housing for people at risk of, or experiencing harm from alcohol or drugs. We also provide advice to carers/families of people experiencing alcohol related harm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Total income:
£1,940,000
Donations and legacies | £2.00k | |
Charitable activities | £1.94m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,603,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.60m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,940,000 from government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.60m |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 25 March 1987: Standard registration
- 08 April 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FOUNDATION66 (Working name)
- ALCOHOL RECOVERY PROJECT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.61m | £6.04m | £5.94m | £4.25m | £1.94m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.63m | £7.14m | £5.81m | £4.82m | £2.60m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £4.25m | £3.99m | £1.94m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £2.00k | £2.65k | £2.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.05m | £6.04m | £5.22m | £4.24m | £1.94m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.27k | £2.00k | £1.00k | £1.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £561.87k | £0 | £715.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.54m | £7.13m | £5.78m | £4.85m | £2.60m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £90.32k | £18.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £25.00k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £696.56k | £530.00k | £510.00k | £5.89m | £6.04m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.94m | £1.64m | £766.00k | £536.00k | £388.00k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | -£1.68m | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.01m | £1.64m | £610.00k | £867.00k | £3.20m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 29 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 29 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 27 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 27 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 29 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 29 October 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 MAR 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 DEC 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 NOV 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 SEP 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 MAR 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF NEED OF THOSE AT RISK OF ALCOHOL OR DRUG DEPENDENCY, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: 4.1 TO PROVIDE FOR THE TREATMENT, CARE, REHABILITATION, TRAINING AND EDUCATION OF PEOPLE EXPERIENCING ALCOHOL OR DRUG PROBLEMS; 4.2 TO PROVIDE, CONSTRUCT, IMPROVE OR MANAGE OR FACILITATE OR ENCOURAGE THE CONSTRUCTION OR IMPROVEMENT OF SOCIAL HOUSING, OTHER HOUSING ACCOMMODATION; 4.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE HARM ASSOCIATED WITH ALCOHOL AND DRUG DEPENDENCY INCLUDING TRAINING FOR PROFESSIONALS AND VOLUNTEERS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Linked charities
- 25 March 1987 : Standard registration
- 08 April 2018 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window