HOLY TRINITY CHURCH CLAPHAM RESTORATION AND DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's activities are maintaining repairing and restoring the fabric fixtures and fittings of Holy Trinity Church, Clapham, London SW4.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lambeth
Governance
- 04 July 1991: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV JAGO WYNNE | Chair | 14 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Emily Jane Hellewell | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Fletcher | Trustee | 14 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43 | £0 | £0 | £347 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 NOVEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
THE MAINTENANCE, REPAIR, RESTORATION, RENOVATION, ALTERATION AND/OR IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC, FURNITURE AND FITTINGS BOTH INTERNALLY AND EXTERNALLY OF THE HOLY TRINITY CHURCH CLAPHAM AND THE RENEWAL, REPLACEMENT, MODERNIZATION, EXTENSION AND/OR IMPROVEMENT OF THE MAINS SERVICES SERVING THE CHURCH INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENRALITY OF THE FOREGOING, DRAINAGE, PLUMBING, HEATING, GAS AND ELECTRICITY SERVICES AND THE PROVISION OF SUCH FURNITURE AND FITTINGS AND EQUIPMENT AS MAY BE DEEMED NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE FUTURE USE OF THE CHURCH FOR CHRISTIAN WORSHIP, PARISH WORK AND COMMUNITY NEEDS.
Area of benefit
HOLY TRINITY CHURCH CLAPHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
31-33 Bromells Road
CLAPHAM
LONDON
SW4 0BN
- Phone:
- 02076270941
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window