Financial history THE BARLEYCORN TRUST

Charity number: 296386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £31.99k £30.55k £27.64k £26.47k £19.08k
Total expenditure £105.94k £146.07k £166.80k £198.59k £167.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A