LEWISHAM ENVIRONMENT TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the Trust is to conserve and enhance the borough's built and natural environment, including its flora and fauna, for the benefit of the people of Lewisham and the nation at large.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lewisham
Governance
- 06 May 1987: Standard registration
- 08 August 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LEWISHAM ENVIRONMENT TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.74k | £211 | £50 | £1 | £170 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.46k | £325 | £395 | £433 | £77 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 26 November 2012 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | 30 July 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | 16 August 2011 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | 13 April 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | 07 April 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH OCTOBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO CONSERVE AND ENHANCE FOR TH BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM AND THE NATION AT LARGE, THE BUILT AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING ITS FLORA AND FAUNA IN THE SAID BOROUGH.
Area of benefit
LEWISHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window