Governing document THURROCK PLAY NETWORK

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND OCTOBER 1986 AS AMENDED ON 22ND JANUARY 1987 AND 8TH SEPTEMBER 1998 as amended on 18 Sept 2024 as amended on 18 Sept 2024 as amended on 13 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
3. The Objects The objects of the association shall be:- 1. to encourage the provision of facilities and services for recreation and other leisure time occupation for children and young people resident in Thurrock being facilities and services: (a) of which such children and young people have need by reason of their youth or social and economic circumstances: and (b) which will improve the conditions of life for such children and young people by promoting their physical, mental and spiritual well being. 2. to further or benefit all residents of Thurrock without distinction of age, sex, sexual orientation, race or of political, religious or other opinions by associating together the said residents and the local authorities, voluntary and other organisations in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation leisure time occupation with the objective of improving the conditions of life for the residents.
Area of benefit
THURROCK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.