HUNTINGTONS DISEASE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief and treatment of those suffering from or believed to be suffering from Huntington's Disease and to provide support to them and their families. The Association also sponsors research and is involved in disseminating the results of research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,266,817
Donations and legacies | £1.77m | |
Charitable activities | £337.14k | |
Other trading activities | £83.71k | |
Investments | £77.53k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,372,725
Raising funds | £293.93k | |
Charitable activities | £2.08m | |
Other | £0 |
£64,416 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £39,597 from 7 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £293.93k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.08m |
People

45 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
5112 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 March 1987: Standard registration
- THE ASSOCIATION TO COMBAT HUNTINGTON'S CHOREA (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Hugh Rickards | Chair | 09 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Bakewell | Trustee | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Kirsty Lisa Lynda Holmes | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Rhys Thomas | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Hubberstey | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nayana Swales | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Duckett | Trustee | 13 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Lyon | Trustee | 14 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sian Baker | Trustee | 14 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr George El-Nimr | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS HEATH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.68m | £1.88m | £2.17m | £2.00m | £2.27m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.58m | £1.30m | £1.42m | £2.03m | £2.37m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £18.34k | £25.00k | £21.00k | £21.53k | £39.60k | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.04k | £90.98k | N/A | £60.41k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.19m | £1.30m | £1.75m | £1.37m | £1.77m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £10.26k | £17.51k | £24.98k | £18.37k | £83.71k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £465.87k | £539.77k | £375.39k | £570.38k | £337.14k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £12.39k | £12.27k | £12.94k | £36.27k | £77.53k | |
|
Income - Other | £2.04k | £6.94k | £1.54k | £5.74k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £257.80k | £364.92k | £808.54k | £297.41k | £634.09k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.40m | £1.12m | £1.20m | £1.74m | £2.08m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £177.95k | £182.80k | £219.77k | £292.65k | £293.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.48k | £7.82k | £11.65k | £11.65k | £12.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £9.32k | £4.62k | £20.14k | £20.36k | £21.71k | |
|
Long-term investments | £374.83k | £452.75k | £948.81k | £875.15k | £1.04m | |
|
Other assets | £856.57k | £1.39m | £1.65m | £1.64m | £1.44m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £151.58k | £104.86k | £130.77k | £154.85k | £154.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/05/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/07/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/10/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/10/2013
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND TREATMENT OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM OR BELIEVED TO BE SUFFERING FROM HUNTINGTON'S DISEASE AND TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR BOTH SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES IN NEED AND FOR RESEARCH AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INTO THE CAUSE AND POSSIBLE CURES WHETHER PARTIAL OR COMPLETE AND POSSIBLE PREVENTION OF THE SAID DISEASE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUITE 24
THE LIVERPOOL SCIENCE PARK
INNOVATION CENTRE 1
131 MOUNT PLEASANT
LIVERPOOL
L3 5TF
- Phone:
- 01513315444
- Email:
- info@hda.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window