THE BRITISH CHIROPODY AND PODIATRY ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND ( BCPA BF)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity distributes raised funds to chiropodists and podiatrists who find themselves in finacial difficulties through circumstances beyond their control
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 April 1987: Standard registration
- THE BRITISH CHIROPODY ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Grace Brown | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Sellars | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Jane Hardisty | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Frost Leadley | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.00k | £1.55k | £5.56k | £4.31k | £3.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.96k | £1.12k | £1.78k | £2.63k | £1.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14TH MARCH 1987 as amended on 20 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF ANY ONE OR MORE PERSONS BEING IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES WHO ARE OR AT ANY TIME HAVE BEEN FELLOWS OR FULL MEMBERS (BUT NOT STUDENT MEMBERS) OF THE BRITISH CHIROPODY ASSOCIATION FOR AT LEAST ONE YEAR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 King Edward Street
BARNSTAPLE
Devon
EX32 7BE
- Phone:
- 07899074195
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window