YEOVIL ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society promotes the preservation and protection of sites, buildings, objects, documents and images that are considered by the Society, to be of significant interest and importance to the archaeology or history of Yeovil and its hinterland through education and information by holding meetings for lectures activities, discussion, fieldwork & research and undertaking a programme of publications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 08 April 1987: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR ANDY DUTCH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mark Ostheimer | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tina Pauline Anne Rowe | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER FOWLER | Trustee | 16 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MOIRA JOSEPHINE GITTOS AMA FSA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN CHARLES GITTOS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Lt Col Stephen Wyatt Bartlett | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.23k | £382 | £1.27k | £1.22k | £1.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.47k | £511 | £1.33k | £1.26k | £1.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH DECEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 2ND DECEMBER 1983 AND 6TH DECEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARCHAEOLOGY AND HISTORY OF YEOVIL DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
YEOVIL DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Mead
Main Street
Chilthorne Domer
YEOVIL
Somerset
BA22 8RD
- Phone:
- 07477 945535
- Email:
- yalhsmarkostheimer@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window