Accounts and annual returns WATERFORD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 296518
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 27 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2007 29 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 06 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 21 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2004 06 June 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required