MRS F B LAURENCE'S CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The stated object of the charity in its Deed of Trust is to provide for the benefit of the Royal National Lifeboat Instituion, King George's Fund for Sailors, Stock Exchange Benevolent Fund, Royal Air Force Benevolent Fund and such other charitable objects or institutions as the trustees in their absolute discretion think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 April 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM GEORGE HAMILTON | Trustee | 22 July 2015 |
|
|||||
Payne Hicks Beach Trust Corporation | Trustee | 28 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE ESTHER MARY FRY | Trustee | 10 January 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.72k | £65.82k | £44.40k | £67.51k | £75.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.10k | £117.35k | £125.12k | £111.67k | £123.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 February 2024 | 303 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 February 2024 | 303 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DEED DATED 24TH FEBRUARY 1976
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL (FROM AND AFTER THE DEATH OF THE SURVIVOR OF THE SETTLOR AND MISS BRENDA LAURENCE) HOLD THE TRUST FUND AS TO BOTH CAPITAL AND INCOME THEREOF OR ALTERNATIVELY IN THEIR DISCRETION UPON FUND TO APPLY THE INCOME THEREOF TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY ONE OR MORE EXCLUSIVE OF THE OTHER OR OTHERS OF THE FOLLOWING: (I) ROYAL NATIONAL LIFEBOAT INSTITUTION OF 42 GROSVENOR GARDENS, LONDON, SW1W 0EF. STOCK EXCHANGE BEVEVOLENT FUND OF 26 AUSTIN FRIARS, LONDON, EC2 ROYAL AIR FORCE BENEVLENT, LONDON, EC2 ROYAL AIR FORCE BENEVOLENT FUND OF 67 PORTLAND, LONDON, W1N 4AP. (II) SUCH CHARITABLE TRUST OR CHARITABLE TRUSTS OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE OBJECT OR CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT OR BY DEED APPOINT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Payne Hicks Beach
10 New Square
Lincoln's Inn
London
Greater London
WC2A 3QG
- Phone:
- 02074654300
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window